Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Viscarra Guadalupe, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Saavedra Walter P., against Doe Manuel, Las Vegas Shuttles Corporation; An Unknown Business Entity, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Margaret Miller Bernal presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Miller Bernal Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateOctober 16, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time120 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 16, 2019Complaint
Date: October 16, 2019Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 17, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 05, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: February 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 30, 2020Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: February 03, 2020Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: March 30, 2020Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: February 13, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.