Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lara Anacleto, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Beckman Joel, against Chavez Kristina, Martinez Margaret, represented by Davis-Houston Whitney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk with Paul T. Suzuki presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul T. Suzuki Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2019 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Filing Court HouseNorwalk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Anacleto Lara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Anacleto Lara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Opposition Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: Kristina Chavez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default; Filed by: Anacleto Lara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Anacleto Lara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Declaration Supplemental Dec of Steven A. Kunysz re: Notice; Filed by: Anacleto Lara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Anacleto Lara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Anacleto Lara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Kristina Chavez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Anacleto Lara (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Default entered as to Kristina Chavez; On the Complaint filed by Anacleto Lara on
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Objection to evidentiary hearing; Filed by: Kristina Chavez (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kristina Chavez (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for TRO and/or Consolidate))
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Opposition (Motion to Consolidate)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for TRO and/or Consolidate)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases: Chavez v. Lara (19NWU...))
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Receipt of Opposition)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: 2019-03-22T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Preliminary Injunction))
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Declaration (Supplemental Dec of Steven A. Kunysz re: Notice)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Order (Order to Show Cause re Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-03-26T00:00:00Motion to Consolidate
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Notice (Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-03-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Objection (to evidentiary hearing)
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Set Hearing Date))
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Set Hearing Date))
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/25/2020)
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/31/2020)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 11/07/2019)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/10/2020)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Temporary Restraining Order a...))
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5) Not...))
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/16/2019)
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Opposition ( to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.