Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gomez Gilbert Maximas Iii Aka Maximas Gomez, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Lori Ann Fournier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLori Ann Fournier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time82 days |
Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 25, 2019Decree Changing Name
Date: October 25, 2019Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 15, 2020Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Gilbert Maximas III Gomez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gilbert Maximas III Gomez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Gilbert Maximas III Gomez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Gilbert Maximas III Gomez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Gilbert Maximas III Gomez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Gilbert Maximas III Gomez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Gilbert Maximas III Gomez (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Gilbert Maximas III Gomez (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: 2019-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: January 15, 2020Decree Changing Name
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.