Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kammel Frances Rebecca Aka Francine Rebecca Kammel, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with Lori Ann Fournier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLori Ann Fournier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2019 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
Decree Changing Name
Date: October 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 22, 2019Petition for Change of Name
Date: October 22, 2019Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by:
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Publication Filed by Frances Rebecca Kammel (Petitioner)
Date: January 08, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Frances Rebecca Kammel (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name; Filed by: Frances Rebecca Kammel (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Decree Changing Name Filed by Frances Rebecca Kammel (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 08, 2020Name Change Criminal History Assessment (REPORT); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Frances Rebecca Kammel (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name Filed by Frances Rebecca Kammel (Petitioner) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Decree Changing Name; Signed and Filed by: Frances Rebecca Kammel (Petitioner)
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Decree Changing Name
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Petition for Change of Name
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Proof of Publication
Date: January 08, 2020Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change))
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.