Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hernandez Scott, against Gasparyan Mariam, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Glendale with Ralph C. Hofer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph C. Hofer Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions96 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseGlendale |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time96 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARIAM GASPARYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARIAM GASPARYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-10
Date: January 27, 2020Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Declaration Re: Copies; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Default entered as to MARIAM GASPARYAN; On the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARIAM GASPARYAN (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 23, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 23, 2019Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: December 13, 2019Summary of the Case
Date: December 13, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)
Date: January 27, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (AGAINST MARIAM GASPARYAN)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Judgment (Default Judgment by Court pursuant to Section 585 of the Code of Civil Procedure)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (Re: Copies)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department D Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) | |
March 06, 2020 | Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims | ||
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Filed by DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff) |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Default Judgment by Court pursuant to Section 585 of the Code of Civil Procedure; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARIAM GASPARYAN (Defendant) | |
January 27, 2020 | Hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Glendale Courthouse at Department D Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Default judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK against Defendant MARIAM GASPARYAN on the Complaint filed by DISCOVER BANK on for damages of $35,293.88 and costs of $517.35 for a total of $35,811.23. | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: DISCOVER BANK (Plaintiff); As to: MARIAM GASPARYAN (Defendant) | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Does: 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.