Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilson, Brenda Mae, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ordaz Mares, Juan Manuel, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Christopher G. Vose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher G. Vose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: Vose, Christopher G |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Respondent filed 1/24/20 Motion to Quash Service of Summons Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Ron Marquez |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Fee Motion to Quash Service of Summons, Declaration of Defendant, Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration re Service of Declaration of Disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.