Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gutierrez, Tiffany Ann, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cortez Vera, Ubaldo, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions20 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time46 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner filed 12/27/19 - Temporary Orders Denied -Amended Request for TRO Denied 12/31/19 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Amended Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Temporary Restraining Order Denied |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) Amended Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order - Minor Children (NF) |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temporary Orders Denied Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Temporary Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.