Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wise, Cameron David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wise, Joline Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: Giordano, Raymond J |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons Filed. Jurisdiction Date; 12-20-2019 | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for Disso, Legal Sep, Nullity, Dom Part | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Status Conference
Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Property Declaration Community and Quasi-Community Property Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.