Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Devenne, Kimberly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Devenne, James, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record, Filed | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment, Filed Marital Status ends 1/13/2021 |
|
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration - Default/Uncontested Disso/Separation, Filed | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Appearance, Stipulations, and Waivers, Filed | |
December 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver - Final Decl of Disclosure, Filed | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-availability, Filed | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC was taken off calendar |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.