Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Tippins, Melanie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Tippins, Ryan Garrett, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Kenneth Merritt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth Merritt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Warrant: Returned and Filed | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned or Undeliverable Mail | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Court CMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.