Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Chopitea, Drina M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chopitea, Tony R., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph J. Solga presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J. Solga Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Solga, Joseph J. |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference CRC: 2/5/24 |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Conference: Readiness
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.