Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Heeley, Kurt, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Heeley, Erin, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts Superior with Robert Stamps presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Stamps Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 2019 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Under Submission for Decision
Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing Respondent's Request for Attorney Fees Judge: Wood, Victoria |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief: Trial Brief re: RFO, Attorney Fees, and Costs |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Susan A Hemb re: Attorney Fees and Costs | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief: Trial | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Western Conference of Teamsters Pension Plan QDRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.