Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Michael David Schoeck, against Roberto Carlos Calvo Y Perez, represented by Larisa K. Raymundo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior Court of Santa Clara - Civil.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Santa Clara - Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting C/F 1-26-21 Judge: Christopher G Rudy |
|
January 27, 2021 | Action | Minute Order | |
January 26, 2021 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Christopher G Rudy |
|
October 20, 2020 | Action | Minute Order | |
October 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting Cont. from 07/14/20 Judge: Sunil R Kulkarni |
|
July 15, 2020 | Action | Minute Order | |
July 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Sunil R Kulkarni |
|
February 25, 2020 | Action | Minute Order | |
February 25, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Laurie Mikkelsen |
|
February 05, 2020 | Action |
Statement: Case Management Conference HRG 2/25/20 - Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.