Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ilia Arami, Noel Keverkezarami, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nia K. Perkins, against Nissan North America, Inc., represented by Paul Stuart Lecky, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary E. Arand Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 02, 2019 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited (37) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: July 02, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 04, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: December 11, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 30, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 01, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 05, 2020Separate Statement
Date: December 10, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 02, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: March 30, 2020Motion: Admissions Deemed Admitted
Date: December 10, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: December 10, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 15, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: October 15, 2019Separate Statement
Date: December 10, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2020 | Hearing | Conference: Further Case Management | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement filed by Nissan North America, Inc. |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Defendant Nissan North America Inc.'s Case Management Statement |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney old: Lecky new: Lecky |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Declaration of Julian D. Lopez in Support of Plaintiffs' Various Discovery Motions Part 2, Exhibits 4-8 |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Declaration of Julian D. Lopez in Support of Plaintiffs' Various Discovery Motions Part 2 |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Separate Statement in Support of Motion for an Order Deeming Truth of Matter in Plaintiffs??? Request for Admissions (Set One) Admitted, or in the Alternative, Compelling Further Responses | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion: Admissions Deemed Admitted Motion for an Order Deeming Truth of Matter in Plaintiffs Request for Admissions (Set One) Admitted, or in the Alternative, Compelling Further Responses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.