Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Clemente Guarneros, Hugo Rondin Ferreyra, Janet De Jesus-Romero, Jonathan Borjas De Jesus, Jovani Borjas De Jesus, (total of 15) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Abid Aziz, against Mohan R. Ravulapati, Ron Ravulapati, Surya P. Ravulapati, represented by Jose Anthony Montalvo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Mary E. Arand presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary E. Arand Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: March 07, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: May 24, 2019Conference: Case Management
Date: June 18, 2019Conference: Trial Setting
Date: January 07, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: June 03, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 07, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: September 01, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: August 27, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 30, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 27, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 19, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2020 | Hearing | Conference: Trial Setting | |
January 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Mary E. Arand |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
August 27, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Mary E. Arand |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Notice of Change of Address |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name Notice of Change of Address |
|
June 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Mary E. Arand |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.