Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
On, Barbara, On, Omar Jay, filed a(n) Civil case against Richey, Donald F, Stephen A Vannucci, Md, Inc, represented by Glynn, Clement Leo, Rapp, Adam Michael, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions44 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time226 days |
Response - No Fee
Date: January 13, 2020Objection - No Fee
Date: February 07, 2020Notice
Date: January 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Set Aside Judgment of Kafele T Hodari Motion hearings - Postdispo Petitioners' Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of W. David Corrick in Support of Petitioners' Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment Motion hearings - Postdispo Petitioners' Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of F Paul Sajben, MD, Inc Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Petitioners' motions to vacate the Judgments entered in favor of F. Paul Sajben, M.D., Inc. on 8/17/20 and in favor of Kafele T. Hodari, M.D., Inc. on 9/17/20 are denied. Petitioners have failed to meet their burden of proof that the Judgments are not final and conclusive as between the parties. Misik v. D'Arco (2011) 197 Cal. App. 4th 1065, 1071. Petitioners' argument that Misik is distinguished is not persuasive. Petitioners' argument that they may bring a separate action against the general partners is irrelevant. And even if the Judgments were vacated, the Court's Order denying the motion to amend the Judgment is a final, and appealable order. Petitioners' argument that the Bankruptcy trustee may seek to hold the general partners liable for the partnership debts is not before this Court, and is not grounds to set aside a Judgment based on a final, appealable Order. Sajben and Hodari shall each submit an Order consistent with this ruling. |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petitioners' Combined Reply Brief to Oppositions to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgments as to Sajben and Hodari Reply |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stephen A. Vannucci, M.D., Inc.'s Response in Support of Petitioners Omar Jay On and Barbara On's Motions to Set Aside and Vacate Judgments Response - No Fee |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Kafele T. Hodari, MD, Inc's Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc Opposition - No Fee |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of F Paul Sajben MD Opposition - No Fee |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Daniel M Poniatowski in Support of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc's Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment in Favor of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc Declaration |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Kafele T Hodari, MD, Inc's Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Judgment Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.