Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson, Mark E, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Hill, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions14 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Proof of Mailing, Order Dismissing Action |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing of Order Dismissing Action | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action
Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Commissioner-Judge Pro Tem
Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment
Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Temporary Restraining Order and Notice of Hearing as to Brian Hill | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Granted Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Civil Harassment
Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.