Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Benedict, Doreen, Benedict, John, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Yurtsan, Andrey R., against Bank Of America, Na, Bank Of America, N A, Clear Recon Corp, Wells Fargo Bank, Na, Wells Fargo Bank, N A, (total of 5) See All represented by Ladi, Laszlo, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management177 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial602 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Management Statement
Date: June 17, 2020Complaint
Date: December 30, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 10 Day Estimate Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference 10 Day Estimate Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 21, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
The Court finds that Defendants have established that there is an overriding interest in sealing the documents, namely the financial privacy rights of the Plaintiffs, to prevent public disclosure of D...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Laszlo Ladi in Support of Motion to Seal Records Lodged Conditionally Under Seal Motion hearings - Predispo Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Seal Records Lodged Conditionally Under Seal; Lodged Doc 3/30/21 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling The Court finds that Defendants have established that there is an overriding interest in sealing the documents, namely the financial privacy rights of the Plaintiffs, to prevent public disclosure of Defendants' trade secrets, and to protect the privacy rights of non-party employees of Defendants that overcomes the right of public access to the records that supports the sealing of the records. The Court finds that a substantial probability exists that the overriding interest will be prejudiced if the record is not sealed. The proposed sealing of call recordings submitted in support of Defendants' motion for summary judgment is narrowly tailored and no less restrictive means exist to achieve the overriding interest. Defendants' Motion to Seal Records Lodged Conditionally Under Seal is unopposed, satisfies the requirements of California Rules of Court Rule 2.550, and is therefore granted. No other records, other than the call recordings submitted in support of Defendants' motion for summary judgment are to be sealed. The Plaintiff shall submit a proposed Order which complies with CRC Rules 2.550(e) and 2.551(e). |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Statement Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication Memorandum of Points and Authorities |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.