Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Robinson, Joseph, filed a(n) Civil case against Honea, Kory, represented by Alpert, Bruce S, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time230 days |
3-20-2020 Addendum to Order re Court Operations and Access
Date: March 20, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: May 13, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: May 13, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: May 13, 2020Answer - No Fee
Date: May 07, 2020Objection - No Fee
Date: April 27, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: May 13, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: May 28, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 31, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 27, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 27, 2020Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 28, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: June 09, 2020Complaint
Date: December 26, 2019Response - No Fee
Date: February 13, 2020Declaration
Date: May 27, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 24, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: June 10, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 12, 2020Declaration
Date: May 27, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 09, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: May 28, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: June 09, 2020Objection - No Fee
Date: May 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 09, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: June 10, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: June 10, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: June 10, 2020Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered
Date: June 12, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal
Date: June 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion - Summary Judgment Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs Motion Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities Motion hearings - Predispo Motion to Strike Answer Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to Opposition to Motion to Strike Answer Motion hearings - Predispo Second Motion to Strike Answer Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response to Opposition to Motion to Bar Gregory Einhorn Motion hearings - Predispo Motion to Bar Gregory Einhorn Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Objection and Response to Motion to Compel Gregory Einhorn to Disclose Identiy, Etc. Motion hearings - Predispo Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Gregory Einhorn to Disclose Identity of the Real Party in Interest and to Show Proof He has Forwarded Plaintiff's Eight Settlement Offers to the Party Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Each of the six motions filed by Plaintiff fail to comply with the mandatory format provisions of Rules of Court 3.1110, 3.1112, and 3.1113. Further, Plaintiff has failed to set forth any factual or legal basis to support any of the requested relief. The motions are denied. |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.