Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Doran, Michael, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gingrich, James Elliott, against Van Tassel, Lauren, represented by Caldwell, Craig Alan, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2020Complaint
Date: December 17, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: June 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Reassignment of All Purpose Judge Notice of Reassignment Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Answer to Complaint Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited Answer to Complaint |
|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial Demand for Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.