Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Farrell, Ashley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Douglass, Jonathan W, against City Of Santa Barbara, Darr, Blair, Santa Barbara Police Department, represented by Shapiro, Tom R, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Geck, Donna D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeck, Donna D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time377 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | CMADRESS Early Settlement Session Report, Filed | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order, Filed | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Geck, Donna D |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.