Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Mahboob, Ericka, Mahboob, Ray, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Other Collections (09) - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal Without Prejudice, Filed | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint Contract, Filed | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.