Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Giorgi, Amber, Mallea, Erik, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Madigan, Kasey, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time197 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.