Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
City Of Goleta, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Ditfurth, Scott W, against County Of Santa Barbara, Fidelity National Title Company, Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, Santa Barbara County Flood Control And Water Conservation District, Santa Barbara Nissan Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Block, Glenn L, Trachtenberg, Jordan, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Eminent Domain/Inv Cond (14) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions370 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Goleta-Nissan - Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: December 23, 2019Stipulation and Order for Continuance, Filed
Date: December 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Goleta-Nissan - Case Management Statement | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Goleta_Nissan - Notice of Continued CMC | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 82078CaseM0048b5 | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Goleta_Nissan_Case_Manag_10_2023_41401325_1_ | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC cont'd to 7/10/23 |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC cont'd to 3/6/23; est 4-6 day Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.