Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Egan, M. Jude, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Alvarado, Lizeth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time101 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Small Claims | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.