Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thermalair Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hurst, Jeffrey S, against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Miramar Acquisition Llc, Tutor Perini Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time146 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service, Filed | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal With Prejudice, Filed | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.