Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) (42) case represented by Dalbey, Christopher B, against Montecito Creek Water Company, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateJune 25, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) (42) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions8 days |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time125 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment, Filed | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation, Filed | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.