Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide, Flint C, against San, Angelita D, represented by Le, Sylvanna Uyen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Beebe, Jed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBeebe, Jed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management79 days |
Filing DateJune 24, 2019 |
CategoryLimited Rule 3.740 Collections (09) - Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial332 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Out of Court Control Conditional Settlement | |
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Beebe, Jed |
|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Order, Filed | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement, Filed | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed | |
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.