Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moshirfatemi, Nastazia, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Murdoch, Diane, Schmitzer, Patrick Scott, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Maxwell, Pauline presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaxwell, Pauline Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Cycle Time59 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Maxwell, Pauline |
|
August 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Undeliverable | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Request Dismiss Entire Action With Prejudice, Filed | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Plaintiff's Claim | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Service by Clerk By Certified Mail, Filed | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing Granted, Filed | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fees, Filed | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt, Filed | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.