Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Golick, Marc, Gonzales, Kathleen, Gonzales, Michael, Loeber, Donald, Loeber, Marie, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Righthand, Scott David, against Calvet Veterans Home Of California, Calvet Veterans Home Of California- Yountville, Department Of General Services, Department Of Veterans Affairs, Napa County, (total of 8) See All represented by Allen, Dale Long, Jr., Finn, Peter Frederick, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMonique S. Langhorne Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2019 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions234 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Mtn for Sep and Vacate Trial - Reply
Date: January 07, 2022Opp State MSJ - Dec of BR - redacted ZZ
Date: January 19, 2022Opp State MSJ - Dec of BR WW - redacted
Date: January 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CMS 10.26.22 SIGNED | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Req for Dism 8.18.22 | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Request: Dismissal | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONTINUING THE ACTION BY MICHELLE CHRISTINE LOEBER AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO MARIE LOEBER S CLAIMS FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL (CCP 377.31) Judge: Young, Scott R.L. |
|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Modify Full and Final Release | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order 2 | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Signed Stipulation to Modify Full and Final Release |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.