Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lugo, Lorena Karr, filed a(n) 43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior with Pebet, Noelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePebet, Noelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2019 |
Category43 Unlimited - Other Petition (Not Specified) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time136 days |
Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet
Date: November 04, 2019Name Change OSC Filed
Date: June 28, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Filed Stipulation for Commissioner Pebet | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Name Change
Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order Attachment | |
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Proof of Publication of Order to Show Cause of Name Change of Lorena Karr Lugo on 7/10/19 |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Name Change OSC Filed Hearing set on: Date: 11-04-2019 Time: 8:30am Dept: 404 |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing NC-120 Order to Show Cause for Change of Name |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Granting Waiver of Court Fees and Cost Signed | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Petition for name change filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.