Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kennard Robert Scott, against Wachtel Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph A. Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeRequest For Dismissal - Before Trial Not Following Adr Or More Than 60 Days Since Adr |
Case Cycle Time36 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 07, 2019Complaint
Date: August 07, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 07, 2019Declaration ( of Non-Service)
Date: September 09, 2019Complaint
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 12, 2019Declaration (of Non-Service)
Date: August 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.