Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ayala Diana, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Wallace Bradley S., against Winco Foods Llc A Limited Liability Company, represented by Pincin James William, Snowden Kelly John, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Antelope Valley with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph A. Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2019 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseAntelope Valley |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Advancement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Winco Foods, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Diana Ayala (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Diana Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Winco Foods, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Winco Foods, LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Diana Ayala (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: May 28, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 28, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 13, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 12, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 25, 2019Answer
Date: July 25, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT)
Date: May 04, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: July 22, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: August 03, 2021Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: August 04, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: September 14, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Advancement) of 05/04/2020)
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Advancement))
Date: 2020-05-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.