Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Stephen Fitzpatrick, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 1998 |
CategoryConservatorship: Person Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 1999 | Docket Event |
Disqualification: of Elector Text = from voting to ctee Legacy Name = Disqualification of Elector Decision = M Closed = 02/04/1999 |
|
February 02, 1999 | Hearing |
Hearing: Appoint Conservator Person
Judge: Department 1 |
|
February 02, 1999 | Docket Event |
Conservator Duties Receipt of Handbook Legacy Name = Duties of Cons/Receipt/Cons Handbook Decision = M Closed = 02/02/1999 |
|
February 02, 1999 | Docket Event |
Letters: Conservatorship General Legacy Name = Ltrs of Conservatorship Issued Decision = M Closed = 02/02/1999 |
|
February 02, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order: Appoint Conservator Person Text = to Stephen fitzpatrick of the person only - no bond required Legacy Name = Order Appointing Conservator Decision = G Closed = 02/02/1999 |
|
February 02, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = Proof of Service Decision = M Closed = 02/02/1999 |
|
January 07, 1999 | Docket Event |
Order Text = Ex-Parte Order appointing Counsel Patricia Vorreiter. Legacy Name = Order Decision = G Closed = 01/07/1999 |
|
January 07, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Legacy Name = Proof of Service Decision = M Closed = 01/07/1999 |
|
January 06, 1999 | Docket Event |
Report: Confidential Information Text = Court Investigators' Appointment Report. Legacy Name = Confidential Report/Information Decision = M Closed = 01/06/1999 |
|
December 29, 1998 | Hearing |
Reserved
Judge: Department 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.