Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arthur Tatarov, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Fabiola Madoo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc of Entry of Jgmt [FL] Decision = M Closed = 05/03/1999 |
|
April 26, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = Decl/Default/Disso/Legal Sep/Nullity Decision = M Closed = 04/26/1999 |
|
April 26, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Property Legacy Name = Property Declaration Decision = M Closed = 04/27/1999 |
|
April 26, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Legacy Name = Proof of Service by Mail Decision = M Closed = 04/27/1999 |
|
April 26, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 Text = mse; 06/30/1999 Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution by FL2336 Decl. Decision = M Closed = 05/03/1999 |
|
February 19, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service/Summons [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 02/23/1999 |
|
February 19, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Property Legacy Name = Property Declaration Decision = M Closed = 02/23/1999 |
|
February 19, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default Legacy Name = Req to Enter Default [FL/CP] Decision = G Closed = 02/19/1999 |
|
February 19, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Legacy Name = Income/Expense Declaration Decision = M Closed = 02/23/1999 |
|
December 30, 1998 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.