Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Randolph J. Lopez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution Summary Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request: Jgmt Disso/Notice: Entry Jgmt Legacy Name = Req:Final Jgmt/Jgmt Disso/Ntc:Entry Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 07/02/1999 |
|
June 29, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Summary Dissolution Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution - Joint Petition Decision = M Closed = 07/02/1999 |
|
December 08, 1998 | Docket Event |
Petition: Summary Dissolution Legacy Name = Joint Petition for Summary Dissolution Decision = M Closed = 12/08/1998 |
|
December 08, 1998 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.