Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelly C. Felice, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Anthony Felice, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 1999 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc of Entry of Jgmt [FL] Decision = M Closed = 02/02/1999 |
|
January 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Dissolution/Default Text = mse: 06/01/1999 Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution by Default Decision = M Closed = 02/02/1999 |
|
January 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice Legacy Name = Family Law Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/22/1999 |
|
January 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = Decl/Default/Disso/Legal Sep/Nullity Decision = M Closed = 01/22/1999 |
|
January 19, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service/Summons [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 01/21/1999 |
|
January 19, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default Legacy Name = Req to Enter Default [FL/CP] Decision = G Closed = 01/19/1999 |
|
December 08, 1998 | Docket Event |
Petition: Dissolution w/minor Legacy Name = Pet: Dissolution of Marriage W/Minor[s] Decision = M Closed = 12/08/1998 |
|
December 08, 1998 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.