Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Suzana Alves Sequeira, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Adalberto Albino Sequeira, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 1999 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc of Entry of Jgmt [FL] Decision = M Closed = 12/15/1999 |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution by FL2336 Decl. Decision = M Closed = 12/15/1999 |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Legacy Name = Stip and Order [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 12/14/1999 |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = Summons [FL] Decision = M Closed = 12/14/1999 |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service of Summons [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 12/14/1999 |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = Decl: Default/Disso/Legal Sep/Nullity Decision = M Closed = 12/10/1999 |
|
December 10, 1999 | Docket Event |
Appearance Stipulation & Waiver Legacy Name = Appear/Stip/Waiver [FL] Decision = M Closed = 12/14/1999 |
|
February 17, 1999 | Docket Event |
Response: Dissolution Legacy Name = Response [FL] Decision = M Closed = 02/17/1999 |
|
December 02, 1998 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 02, 1998 | Docket Event |
Petition: Dissolution no minor Legacy Name = Pet: Dissolution of Marriage/No minors Decision = M Closed = 12/02/1998 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.