Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brenda U. Ornelas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Robert J. Ornelas, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) Legacy Name = Ntc of Entry of Jgmt [FL] Decision = M Closed = 04/13/1999 |
|
March 30, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default/DS/LS Legacy Name = Decl/Default/Disso/Legal Sep/Nullity Decision = M Closed = 03/30/1999 |
|
March 30, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 Text = mse; 07/21/1999 Legacy Name = Jgmt of Dissolution by FL2336 Decl. Decision = M Closed = 04/13/1999 |
|
March 30, 1999 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) Legacy Name = Decl: Service of Final Decl/Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 03/30/1999 |
|
March 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default Legacy Name = Req to Enter Default [FL/CP] Decision = G Closed = 03/04/1999 |
|
January 28, 1999 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = Summons [FL] Decision = M Closed = 01/29/1999 |
|
January 28, 1999 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service of Summons [FL/DA/CP] Decision = M Closed = 01/29/1999 |
|
January 28, 1999 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgement/Receipt Legacy Name = Ntc/Acknowledgment of Receipt Decision = M Closed = 01/29/1999 |
|
November 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Petition: Dissolution no minor Legacy Name = Pet: Dissolution of Marriage/No minors Decision = M Closed = 11/16/1998 |
|
November 16, 1998 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.