Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Santa Clara, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Juan Martinez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Bulk Scanned Documents | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail stip & order (d; otp) |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order - No Fee | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration for default filed (p) |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Other DA Support/Default 1st suppl re: parental obligations |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request: Entry of Default/CS | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Entry of Default/CS denied - default premature |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed 1st suppl |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Complaint: Supplemental (DCSS) 1st |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.