Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tsai Fen Lee, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thomas C Crenshaw, against Matthew Zuckerman, Mark Koz, Masato Hata, Intelligent Instruments Corp., Futuretel Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Patrick Baldwin, Anna Erickson White, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2001 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: CRENSHAW, THOMAS C. P.O. BOX 10705 OAKLAND, CA 94610-0705 (510) 444-5988 Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: BALDWIN, LAW OFFICES OF PATRICK BALDWIN, PATRICK 530 OAK GROVE AVE. SUITE 207 MENLO PARK, CA 94025 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: MORRISON & FOERSTER - PALO ALTO WHITE, ANNA ERICKSON 755 PAGE MILL RD PALO ALTO, CA 94304-1018 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
November 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = MOTION Description NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFTS MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ATTY BALDWIN) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 18, 2001 | Hearing | Review: Arbitration Order | |
October 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order Text = MOTION Description ORDER GRANTING MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SIGNED BY JUDGE WARD Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 16, 2001 | Hearing | Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication | |
October 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Text = MOTION Description DECL OF PATRICK BALDWIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFT MARK KOZ' OPP TO PLNTFF'S EX PARTE APPL TO EXT ... Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Text = MOTION Description DECL OF PATRICK BALDWIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFT MARK KOZ' MTN FOR SUMM JDGMNT/ADJUDICATION Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.