Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alberta J. Elkington, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David M Trapani, against Jorge Chavez, Ozuna Foods, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 1998 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: TRAPANI, LAW OFFICES OF DAVID M. TRAPANI, DAVID M. 690 SARATOGA AVENUE SUITE 206 SAN JOSE, CA 95129 (000) 000-0000 X Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 08, 1998 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 15 |
|
June 25, 1998 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL WPE CMPL. BY DAVID TRAPANI Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 15, 1998 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Text = MOTION Description > COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS ISSUED ATTY DAVID TRAPANI Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 15, 1998 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.