Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sharon Cristal, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Benjamin Rafael Levinson, against Anthony Cocciardi, Giovanna Cocciardi, represented by Martin N. Lettunich, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 1998 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: LETTUNICH, MARTIN N. 12333 S. SARATOGA-SUNNYVALE RD SUITE A SARATOGA, CA 95070 (408) 865-1000 Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: LEVINSON, BENJAMIN R. 577 SALMAR AVE., SUITE 125 CAMPBELL, CA 95008 (408) 866-2999 Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
September 05, 2002 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 21 |
|
July 12, 2002 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY ATTY BENJAMIN R LEVINSON Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
Decision Text = MOTION Description NTC: CASE STATUS REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 17, 2000 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 15 |
|
February 17, 2000 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Text = MOTION Description * CMCQ FILED ON 2/14/00 W/O M&C BY: BENJAMIN LEVINSON 5A Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
December 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Decision Text = MOTION Description NTC: CASE STATUS REVIEW RE BANKRUPTCY ** NO FORMAL NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILED* Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 25, 1999 | Hearing |
Review: Arbitration Order
Judge: Department 13 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.