Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Pacific Bell A California Corporation, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Limited (42) - Under 10,000 case represented by Michael Akira Sawamura, against Goldberg Irene Etta, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Kevin E. McKenney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin E. McKenney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 1997 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Limited (42) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Application: Renewal Judgment Text = $6810.25 Legacy Name = CV Appl for Renewal of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2005 |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Text = Costs$0.00 Credit $0.00 Interest $2831.17 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2005 |
|
March 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice: Renewal of Judgment Issued Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Renewal of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2005 |
|
March 25, 1998 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: OLD DEPT |
|
March 25, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 01:30, Dept: 37, Operator: LLG Bail: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Decision = M Closed = 03/25/1998 |
|
March 25, 1998 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Judgment Submitted To D/37 Heard By: Judge K. McKenney Department 37 Decision = M Closed = 10/31/1997 |
|
December 09, 1997 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment: Issued Text = Document Issued -- Abstract of Judgment. Operator: SC Fee: $7.00 Decision = M Closed = 12/09/1997 |
|
December 03, 1997 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document Noted -- Comments. Description: Dwa/Mail Operator: JYL Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 12/03/1997 |
|
November 17, 1997 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document Noted -- Comments. Description: Priority Mail Operator: RTN Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 11/17/1997 |
|
November 17, 1997 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = Document Filed -- Notice of. Description: Entry Of Default Jgmt By Court W/Proof Operator: RTN Fee: $0.00 Decision = M Closed = 11/17/1997 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.