Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Avco Financial Srv So Ca Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lopez Rosario, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 1997 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 1998 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 96 |
|
February 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Default On Contract; Cont'D From 1/16/98 For Plaintiff Decision = M Closed = 02/17/1998 |
|
February 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = Document -- Dismissal of Action. Operator: SLM Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Comment: Entire Action Dismissed Without Prejudice. Dismissal Filed In Court Before Case Was Called. Legacy Name = Request for Dismissal Decision = M Closed = 02/17/1998 |
|
February 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 01:00, Dept: 06, Operator: SLM Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 02/17/1998 |
|
January 16, 1998 | Hearing |
Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant
Judge: Department 96 |
|
January 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Document -- Appearance Minutes. Operator: HMR Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed By: Pro Tem Richard Maddigan Party Name: Charlene Pryor Party Name: (Not Present) Proceedings: Date: 02/17/1998, Time: 01:00PM -- Minutes Are Recorded As Follows: Request Made By Plaintiff Court Stipulation To Plaintiff Legacy Name = Other [CV] Decision = M Closed = 01/16/1998 |
|
January 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Default On Contract Decision = M Closed = 01/16/1998 |
|
January 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing -- Date: 02/17/1998, Time: 01:00 SC01 Small Claims-Converted Legacy Document 3B. Dept: 06 Operator: HMR Fee Amount: $0.00, Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 01/16/1998 |
|
January 16, 1998 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Hearing Result Posting -- Date: , Time: 01:00, Dept: 06, Operator: HMR Bail Amount: $0.00, Bail Status Code/Name: None/No Status Provided Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 01/16/1998 |
|
January 07, 1998 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Text = Document -- Proof of Service On. Description: Rob Bonifield Sub-Served $50.00 Operator: LDC Fee Amount: $0.00 Document Filed Legacy Name = Proof of Service-Small Claims Decision = M Closed = 01/07/1998 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.