Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Linh Hoang, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Truc Nguyen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 1998 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2009 | Hearing | OSC: Custody/Visitation/Support | |
June 03, 2009 | Hearing | OSC: Custody/Visitation/Support | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Text = osc, appl, appl attachment,bl resp decl, fin stmt,adr-lag Legacy Name = FL Proof of Personal Svc Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2009 |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Reissuance of OSC/TRO Text = c/f 6/3/09, 1st reissuance-lmg Legacy Name = FL OSC:Reissue |
|
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC: Custody/Child Support/Visitation Text = amended-lmg Legacy Name = FL OSC:Custody/Visit/Child Supt Decision = M Closed = 05/19/2009 |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Order Text = f/w granted for 4 months gj. Legacy Name = FL Ord:Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 04/29/2009 |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC: Custody/Child Support/Visitation Text = gj. Legacy Name = FL OSC:Custody/Visit/Child Supt Closed = 06/29/2009 |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Application Legacy Name = FL Appl:Fee Waiver Decision = M Closed = 04/29/2009 |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order: Mediated Agreement Text = with pos by mail Legacy Name = FL Ord:Mediated Agreement Decision = M Closed = 09/22/2008 |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Text = (r) findings & ord jp Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Mail Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.