Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Level One Communications Incorporated, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Unknown, against Mark S. Webster, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 1998 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: GLASSBERG POLLAK & ASSOCIATES 425 CALIFORNIA ST., SUITE 850 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94104-2193 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94111-3993 (415) 291-8320 Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 30, 2002 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Satisfaction Text = MOTION Description ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT IN FULL Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 27, 1999 | Hearing | Hearing: Order of Examination | |
March 05, 1999 | Docket Event |
Other Text = MOTION Description ......JUDGE BAINES (ATTY: BRANDON HEMLEY) 5/27 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
March 05, 1999 | Docket Event |
Application for order for judgment debtor exam Text = MOTION Description APPL & ORD FOR APP & EXAM OF MARK WEBSTER INDV& DBA LEADING EDGE EXECUTIVE SEARCH BY...CONT Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
February 18, 1999 | Hearing | Review: Case Status | |
February 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment Text = MOTION Description ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED AGNST: LEADING EDGE EXECUTIVE SEARCH $62,003.85 (B. HEMLEY) Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
January 22, 1999 | Hearing | Hearing: Request for Default Judgment | |
January 22, 1999 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default Text = MOTION Description > JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY COURT JUDGE ELFVING Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.