Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mac Mckinley, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Unknown, against Mountain View-Los Altos Union High Schoo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 1999 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = ATTORNEY INFORMATION Type - ATTY: REEVE-WILSON, GREGORY 2165 S. BASCOM AVE. #A CAMPBELL, CA 95008 (408) 558-5219 Legacy Name = Attorney Information Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
June 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Not Active Legacy Name = Case data converted on 06/28/2003 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 27, 1999 | Docket Event |
Notice Text = MOTION Description NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY JOHN WILLIAMS MEDIATOR Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 18, 1999 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Text = MOTION Description > REQUEST DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE BY GREGORY REEVE-WILSON Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
October 07, 1999 | Hearing | Review: Mediation Status | |
August 05, 1999 | Hearing | Review: Mediation Status | |
August 05, 1999 | Docket Event |
Decision Text = MOTION Description NTC: MEDIATION STATUS REVIEW CONT. FROM 8-5-99 Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 05, 1999 | Docket Event |
Decision Text = MOTION Description NTC: MEDIATION STATUS REVIEW Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
May 04, 1999 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Text = MOTION Description STIP & ORD TO MEDIATION IN LIEU OF ARBITRATION BY STEVEN DIPPELL SIGNED HON. HERLIHY Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2003 |
|
April 02, 1999 | Hearing | Review: Arbitration Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.