Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gros De Mange Brian T, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Denike Michael, Denike Design Development Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 1991 |
CategorySmall Claims $0 - $1500 |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 1992 | Hearing | Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant | |
March 09, 1992 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Breach Of Contract Heard By: Commissioner L. Steingart Department 43 Decision = M Closed = 03/09/1992 |
|
February 10, 1992 | Hearing | Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant | |
February 10, 1992 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = Hearing Motion: H998 -- Breach Of Contract Heard By: Commissioner L. Steingart Department 43 Continuance Scheduled For: 03/09/1992 Decision = M Closed = 02/10/1992 |
|
December 10, 1991 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 10, 1991 | Docket Event |
Not Active Text = Complaint -- SCMN Money-Converted Legacy Document 1A. Dept: Not Specified, Operator: Fee Amount: $0.00, Complaint Amount: $0.00 Party Military Status Not Specified Complaint Summons Not Issued Number of Additional Unidentified Persons Potentially Affected by Judgment: 01 Legacy Name = conversion - other Decision = M Closed = 12/10/1991 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.