Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kathy Pappas filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 1998 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 1998 | Docket Event |
Petition: Other Text = discharge of personal representative Legacy Name = Petition For ___ Decision = M Closed = 05/21/1998 |
|
May 21, 1998 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order: Final Discharge Legacy Name = Order for Final Discharge Decision = G Closed = 05/21/1998 |
|
April 21, 1998 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = signed by David S. Hoffman Legacy Name = Receipt of Distributee... Decision = M Closed = 04/21/1998 |
|
April 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = receipt for payment of distributive share signed by George Pappas Legacy Name = Receipt of Distributee... Decision = M Closed = 04/17/1998 |
|
April 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Text = receipt for payment of distributive share signed by Demetra Pappas Legacy Name = 0ther... Decision = M Closed = 04/17/1998 |
|
April 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = receipt for payment of distributive share signed by Evangelos G. Kakouros Legacy Name = Receipt of Distributee... Decision = M Closed = 04/17/1998 |
|
April 17, 1998 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Distribution (PR) Text = receipt for payment of distributive share signed by Steve G. Kakouros Legacy Name = Receipt of Distributee... Decision = M Closed = 04/17/1998 |
|
February 19, 1998 | Hearing | Hearing: Waiver Accounting/Final Distribution | |
February 19, 1998 | Docket Event |
Order: Final Distribution Legacy Name = Order for Final Distribution Decision = G Closed = 02/19/1998 |
|
January 23, 1998 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal - No Fee Text = w/proof of service (hearing set for 02-19-98) Legacy Name = Ntc of Hrg Decision = M Closed = 01/23/1998 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.